U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richmond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • October 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 13, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 15, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • September 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.