U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 07, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Change of Address]
  • January 27, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 22, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • June 22, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • June 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 22, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 25, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.