U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:09-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKeller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 20, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.