U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dodd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • January 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 06, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.