U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00021-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 19, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Change of Address]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 23, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 01, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 23, 2021: [Response to Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 27, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • March 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • January 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 06, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 18, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 12, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 26, 2019: [Change of Address]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 08, 2018: [Remark]
  • January 04, 2018: [Letter]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 07, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 27, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 18, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 12, 2017: [Affidavit]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 22, 2017: [Remark]
  • May 22, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • May 22, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Remark]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Attachment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.