U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirtley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 06, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 31, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • March 31, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.