U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:05-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • January 11, 2018: [Warrant]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 01, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Address]
  • October 21, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.