U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 20, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 17, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.