U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:04-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGilberry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 22, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • November 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • October 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.