U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • May 08, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • May 08, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 07, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order to Unseal Document]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 12, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.