U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kalantari
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 20, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • August 17, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 04, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 30, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • March 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Response]
  • December 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 21, 2016: [Response]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 06, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 07, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 07, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Remark]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.