U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mathis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 03, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 01, 2017: [Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.