U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chamberlain et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 24, 2016: [Application for Writ]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.