U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodruff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Attachment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.