U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denyer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • August 19, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 23, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 06, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 05, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 07, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 22, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 07, 2017: [Restricted Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.