U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00028-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Jordan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Change of Address]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change of Address]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • February 02, 2021: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 10, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Change of Address]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Response]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • December 18, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.