U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.