U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wakeland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 17, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 12, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 12, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.