U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stokes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • July 02, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • March 30, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 23, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • May 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 20, 2017: [Letter]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.