U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:90-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Molette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 18, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • January 18, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 02, 2016: [Add Counts]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.