U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Bond]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.