U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:00-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 02, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • January 02, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.