U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Response to Order]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 04, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.