U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00020-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Deville et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2017: [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • November 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.