U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 07, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.