U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moody
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • April 30, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 04, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • July 31, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 22, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.