U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 03, 2017: [Quash]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 13, 2016: [Remark]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 07, 2016: [Quash]
  • December 05, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 14, 2016: [Application for Writ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2016: [Application for Writ]
  • November 08, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.