U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2021: [Change of Address]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • June 22, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Change of Address]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.