U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villalva-Patricio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Rebuttal]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 09, 2020: [Rebuttal]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Receipt - Release of Exhibits]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Remark]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 29, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • January 12, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 12, 2018: [Remark]
  • January 09, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 09, 2018: [Sealed Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • November 08, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 02, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2017: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 11, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2017: [Response]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 06, 2017: [Response]
  • July 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2017: [Unseal Document]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 25, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 03, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • May 03, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 17, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 07, 2017: [Compel]
  • February 07, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • January 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 10, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 09, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 09, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.