U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • January 09, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • January 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.