U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klauser
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • November 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.