U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 13, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • December 09, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.