U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mc-00968
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Francois
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Contempt Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Warrant Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 12, 2017: [Report and Recommendations - IRS Summons]
  • April 04, 2017: [Show Cause Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.