U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.