U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDonald et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 15, 2018: [Application for Writ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • September 29, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.