Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Calendar Setting]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Discovery]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-2
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:16-cr-00098-1
    Party Name:USA v. Singleton et al
    Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?94157

Post Your Comment or Question

3 x 3 =