U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00005-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 02, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 05, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 12, 2020: [Bond]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 22, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 28, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 12, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 11, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 07, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 28, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • September 07, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 24, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 16, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 15, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • August 09, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 09, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 21, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 21, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 03, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • July 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 30, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.