U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Mail Returned]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • February 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • January 17, 2017: [Writ]
  • January 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.