U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bond]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 09, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • February 09, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.