U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Remark]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • July 11, 2022: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 01, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 01, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 09, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 21, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • October 20, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 15, 2020: [USCA Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • May 30, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • September 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 13, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 01, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Mail Returned]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • June 13, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 13, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 11, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 01, 2017: [Response]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 13, 2017: [Remark]
  • September 13, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Waiver]
  • March 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.