U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 16, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • March 09, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.