U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOPEZ-VICENTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 28, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 07, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 22, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • March 22, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.