U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 27, 2017: [Transcript Request]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Suppress]
  • April 10, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 23, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 22, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.