U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kimble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 15, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 08, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 17, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.