U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marks et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Remark]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Remark]
  • June 25, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 15, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 11, 2019: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • April 23, 2018: [Release of Funds]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • January 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • January 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • August 30, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 29, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 22, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 21, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • June 20, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 20, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • June 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Waiver]
  • June 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 07, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.