U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hobson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 20, 2017: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.