U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Street
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 28, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 22, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 22, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response in Support]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Seal or Restrict]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Remark]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Epps Successive]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • December 09, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • December 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 26, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Attachment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2017: [Waiver]
  • August 02, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2017: [Remark]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • July 25, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.