U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valdez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 18, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 10, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • August 10, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.