U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rushing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order For Restitution]
  • September 06, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order to Seal Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Restricted Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 20, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2018: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 25, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • January 25, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 11, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 03, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.