U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 16, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 10, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Attachment]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Rebuttal]
  • September 16, 2020: [Attachment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 14, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 10, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 17, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • January 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 04, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 21, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 19, 2018: [Bond]
  • March 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 15, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2017: [Bond]
  • November 06, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2017: [Waiver]
  • November 02, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 03, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • October 03, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.